EP0942048 - Polymerization process for preparing latex binders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington Delaware 19803-7663 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phan, Lien 99 Bristol Road East, Unit 155 Mississauga, Ontario L4Z 3P4 / CA | 02 /
Farwaha, Rajeev 59 Ashwood Crescent Brampton, Ontario L6T 1M1 / CA | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103944.7 | 08.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | US19980036825 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: US 36825 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942048 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C09D157/12, C08F2/28 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
C08F226/02 (EP,US);
C08F2/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polymerisationsverfahren zur Herstellung von Emulsionsbindemittel | [1999/37] | English: | Polymerization process for preparing latex binders | [1999/37] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation de liants latex | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/49] | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9832773 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * page 2, line 4 * * page 75, line 2 - line 10 * * page 77, line 18 - page 78, line 10; claims 63-129 *; | [XP]WO9832726 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,3* examples 11,12 * |