EP0940466 - Method of refining waste oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLIM TECHNOLOGIES SA Avenue de Rumine 37 1005 Lausanne / CH | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Lucking, David John Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lucking, David John Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/36] | Lucking, David John FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104198.9 | 02.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | GB19980004481 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9804481 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940466 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940466 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C10M175/00, C10G21/00, B01D1/30 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C10G21/28 (EP);
C10G21/006 (EP);
C10G21/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | C10M175/00, C10G21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Raffination von Altöl | [1999/36] | English: | Method of refining waste oil | [1999/36] | French: | Procédé de raffinage d'huile usée | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2003 | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2145730 (SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE) [X] 1,2,8,10 * claim 1 *; | [XY]GB1364942 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION) [X] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [Y]FR2301592 (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [Y] 11,12 * page 1, line 10 - line 17 * * page 3, line 13 - line 28 * * page 2, line 4 - line 15 *; | [DXA]WO9521902 (INTERLINE RESOURCES CORPORATION) [DX] 10 * page 13, line 22 - line 26; claims 1,5,36,41 * * page 14, line 10 - line 18 * [A] 1; | [XA]US4502944 (S.R. NELSON) [X] 10,11 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1; | [DA]US2196989 (R.W. HENRY) [DA] 1-3 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 43 *; | [A]WO9006350 (SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE) [A] * claim 1 * |