EP0954084 - Device for the quick change over of wire guiding shrouds in an armature winding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOP S.p.A. Localita Cipressino, 20 50021 Barberino Val d'Elsa (Firenze) / IT | [1999/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponzio, Massimo Via Strada di Codilungo, 20 50021 Barberino V. Elsa (Fi) / IT | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Via A. Della Spina 40 56125 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 99104362.1 | 04.03.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | IT1998PI00033 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: IT PI980033 | [1999/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954084 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/085 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H02K15/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] |
Former [2000/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 05.07.2000 | Title | German: | Schnellwechselvorrichtung für Wicklungsschablonen in Ankerwicklungsmaschinen | [1999/44] | English: | Device for the quick change over of wire guiding shrouds in an armature winding machine | [1999/44] | French: | Dispositif pour le changement rapide des gabarits de bobinage dans les machines à bobiner les rotors | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, FI, GR, LU, MC | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.06.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.06.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | 13.06.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.06.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2144477 (RALPH ABRAMS) [AD] 1 * page 1, column R, line 21 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US3361371 (DICKENSHEETS CARLTON O, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 19; figure 5 *; | [A]US4765551 (PAGE TEDDY L [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 3 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]US4974313 (REIGER JR ARTHUR C [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US5064128 (IWASE HIDEAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 55; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP0484766 (AXIS SPA [IT]) [AD] 1 * abstract * |