EP1033636 - Watch with means for introducing electrical connection means into the watch case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 2501 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubugnon, Dominique Le Vallon 1131 Tolochenaz / CH | 02 /
Born, Jean-Jaques Rue Louis de Savoie 59 1110 Morges / CH | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99104365.4 | 04.03.1999 | [2000/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033636 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G04G1/00, G04G17/06, // H01R13/52 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G04G17/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | G04G1/00, // H01R13/52 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Uhr mit Vorrichtung um elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtungen im Uhrengehäuse einzu führen | [2000/36] | English: | Watch with means for introducing electrical connection means into the watch case | [2000/36] | French: | Montre comportant des moyens permettant l'introduction de moyens de connexion électrique à l'intérieur d'un boîtier de la montre | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2284149 (DELTA TRANSNATIONAL INC) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0660204 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-14 * figures 25-31 *; | [A]US2985291 (A.SCHOEPE ET AL.) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2604566 (SPINNER GMBH ELEKTROTECH) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * |