EP0940843 - Apparatus for heat-treating substrate and method for separating the substrate from the apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2006/44] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satou, Yasuyuki NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104402.5 | 04.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | JP19980053243 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5324398 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940843 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940843 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940843 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H01L21/68742 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/29] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung eines Substrats und Verfahren zur Trennung des Substrats von der Vorrichtung | [1999/36] | English: | Apparatus for heat-treating substrate and method for separating the substrate from the apparatus | [1999/36] | French: | Dispositif pour traiter thermiquement un substrat et méthode pour séparer le substrat du dispositif | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07201718 ; | [A]EP0482907 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-39 * the whole document * * figures 3A,3B,5A,5B,7A,7B *; | [A]US5569350 (OSADA TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-39 * the whole document * * figures 12-14B *; | [A]US5683518 (MOORE GARY M [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * column 37, line 11 - line 35 * * figure 11E *; | [A]JPH0637172 ; | US5738165 [ ] (IMAI YUJI [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * * figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07201718 A 19950804 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-39 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940513), vol. 018, no. 252, Database accession no. (E - 1547), & JP06037172 A 19940210 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-39 * abstract * |