EP1035453 - Dial comprising brilliants, applied ornaments or other attached elements and process for fixing such elements onto such a dial [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2003/12] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bossel, Christophe Chemin du Milieu 19 1400 Yverdon / CH | 02 /
Koelbl, Erwin Rue de la Combe-Gréde 2613 Villeret / CH | 03 /
Iten, Grégoire Route Chènevières-Nord 133 1958 Uvrier/Saint-Léonard / CH | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99104416.5 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035453 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035453 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G04D3/00, G04B19/10, G04B47/04 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
G04B19/103 (EP,KR,US);
G04B19/10 (EP,US);
G04B47/042 (EP,KR,US);
G04D3/0048 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/22] |
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zifferblatt für Uhren mit Brillanten, Auflegestücken oder anderen eingesetzen Elementen und Verfahren zur Befestigung dieser Elemente an einem solchen Zifferblatt | [2000/37] | English: | Dial comprising brilliants, applied ornaments or other attached elements and process for fixing such elements onto such a dial | [2000/37] | French: | Cadran comportant des brillants, appliques ou autres éléments rapportés et procédé de fixation de ces éléments sur un tel cadran | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09119986 ; | [Y]JPH01193169 ; | [A]WO9905233 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7-10 * abstract *; | [A]CH33104 (ARNOULD JULES [CH]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5882180 ; | [A]JPS58189575 ; | [A]DE1943075 (UEBELHARDT ROGER) [A] 8 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09119986 A 19970506 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891106), vol. 013, no. 485, Database accession no. (M - 887), & JP01193169 A 19890803 (TSUBOMAN:KK) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830809), vol. 007, no. 180, Database accession no. (P - 215), & JP58082180 A 19830517 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840214), vol. 008, no. 033, Database accession no. (P - 254), & JP58189575 A 19831105 (DAINI SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 8 * abstract * | by applicant | CH260123 |