EP0941903 - Automatic brake control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiwatashi, Yutaka c/o SUBARU Laboratory 9-6 Oosawa 3-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo, 181-0015 / JP | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/37] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104889.3 | 11.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | JP19980061579 | 12.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6157998 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941903 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0941903 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941903 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/22, B60T7/04, B60T13/68 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T7/22 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0604 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/49] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbsttätige Bremssteueranlage | [1999/37] | English: | Automatic brake control system | [1999/37] | French: | Système automatique de commande de freinage | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 15.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03026615.9 / EP1405753 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH06144169 ; | [A]EP0484995 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE19712802 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940824), vol. 018, no. 453, Database accession no. (M - 1662), & JP06144169 A 19940524 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06144169 | JPH082274 |