EP0946030 - Mobile telephone and method of retrieving reception/transmission history in mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toba, Hiroyuki, c/o NEC Saitama, Ltd. 300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara, Kamikawamachi Kodama-gun, Saitama / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/39] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105070.9 | 23.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980075412 | 24.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7541298 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0946030 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0946030 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946030 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/27, H04M1/57 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H04M1/271 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M2250/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mobiltelefon und Verfahren zum Wiederauffinden der Sende-/Empfangsgeschichte des Geräts | [2006/34] | English: | Mobile telephone and method of retrieving reception/transmission history in mobile telephone | [1999/39] | French: | Téléphone mobile et procédé de restitution de l'historique en émission/réception de l'appareil | [2007/43] |
Former [1999/39] | Mobiltelefon und Verfahren zum Wiederauffinden die Sende/Empfangsgeschichte des Geräts | ||
Former [1999/39] | Téléphone mobile et procédé de restitution de l'historique en émission et réception de l'appareil | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0788268 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, line 30 - line 40 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 11 * * figure 6 *[A] 2,5 |