EP1040782 - A tooth cleaning assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horng, Bae-Yan No. 3-1, Alley 4, Lane 81, Kuang Chou St. Taipei City / TW | [2000/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105179.8 | 31.03.1999 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040782 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040782 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/18, B65D83/00, A45F3/20 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
A46B11/0058 (EP,US);
A46B11/0006 (EP,US);
A46B17/02 (EP,US);
A47K5/18 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/25] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zahnreinigungsvorrichtung | [2000/40] | English: | A tooth cleaning assembly | [2000/40] | French: | Ensemble pour le nettoyage des dents | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 05.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2004 | CH | 19.05.2004 | IT | 19.05.2004 | LI | 19.05.2004 | NL | 19.05.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | DE | 20.08.2004 | ES | 30.08.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
NL | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
DE | 20.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
DE | 20.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5230444 (DUNBAR WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US3198389 (DUNNING THOMAS B) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5638840 (LEE INITA [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB1296372 (AUBIT PLASTICS LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4430313 (FISCHER AG [LI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5261532 (FAUCI KEITH [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE19540528 (GERDA GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |