EP0956919 - Screw thread-cutting chuck with minimal lubrification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emuge-Werk Richard Glimpel Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge (vormals Moschkau & Glimpel) Nürnberger Strasse 96-100 D-91207 Lauf / DE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazda, Thomas Salzlecke 12 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105214.3 | 13.03.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE1998121186 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821186 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956919 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956919 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/02, B23Q11/10 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B23Q11/1046 (EP,US);
B23B31/083 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0036 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17111 (EP,US);
Y10T408/45 (EP,US);
Y10T408/455 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gewindeschneidfutter mit Minimalmengenschmierung | [1999/46] | English: | Screw thread-cutting chuck with minimal lubrification | [1999/46] | French: | Mandrin de filetage avec lubrification minimale | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4218237 (WELLACH ADOLF [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0464335 (GLIMPEL EMUGE WERK [DE]) [A] 1 * siehe Referenzzeichen 10 und 11 * |