EP0944059 - Magnetic recording/reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirabayashi, Koichiro 1-9-5, Yamanoue Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Konishi, Akio 408-3, Kamo Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Yanagihara, Takefumi 232-9, Kou, Shimoshimayama Saijo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99105259.8 | 15.03.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | JP19980070169 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7016998 | JP19980364523 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36452398 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944059 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944059 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/665, G11B15/43 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G11B15/6653 (EP,US);
G11B15/44 (KR);
G11B15/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/22] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetisches Aufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät | [1999/38] | English: | Magnetic recording/reproduction apparatus | [1999/38] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction magnétique | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4437129 (YOSHIDA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 46 * * column 4, line 5 - line 38 ** column 6, line 56 - column 9, line 44 *; | [XA]EP0396018 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 42 * [A] 4-6,10-12; | [A]EP0435238 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 9, line 54 *; | [XA]US5167380 (CHOI SUNG HOON [KR]) [X] 1,3,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 3 * [A] 2,4-6,8,10-12; | [XA]US5180117 (KATOHNO NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 43 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 52 * [A] 4-6,10-12 |