EP0953753 - Method for avoiding jolts when accelerating motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flinspach, Roland Grossglattbach Strasse 23 75446 Wiernsheim / DE | 02 /
Haller, Andreas Taubenheimstrasse 44 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Moser, Franz Limburgweg 10 73269 Hochdorf / DE | 04 /
Rink, Günter Öschstrasse 3 73111 Lauterstein / DE | [1999/44] | Application number, filing date | 99105535.1 | 18.03.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | DE1998119049 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819049 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953753 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953753 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/10, F02D11/10 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
F02D41/10 (EP,US);
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1015 (EP,US);
F02D2250/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vermeidung von Ruckelschwingungen beim Beschleunigen von Kraftfahrzeugen | [1999/44] | English: | Method for avoiding jolts when accelerating motor vehicles | [1999/44] | French: | Méthode pour éviter les secousses lors d' accélérations de véhicules à moteur | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0449160 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 34 * * page 7, line 51 - page 10, line 52 * * page 12, line 55 - page 13, line 23 * * page 14, line 43 - page 16, line 3 * * page 17, line 49 - page 18, line 33 * * figures 25B,27A,27B,32,36A,44 *; | [X]DE19534633 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 5 - line 67 * * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 25 * * column 6, line 22 - line 62 * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]DE3738719 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0250873 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column W * |