EP0945882 - Low noise relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [2001/10] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritter, Peter Harriesstrasse 5 13629 Berlin / DE | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter, et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Hirsch, Peter, et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105690.4 | 19.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE1998113530 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813530 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945882 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945882 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945882 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/30 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H01H50/305 (EP,US);
H01H2009/0278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/29] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schallreduziertes Relais | [1999/39] | English: | Low noise relay | [1999/39] | French: | Relais à faible bruit | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.12.2006 | GB | 27.12.2006 | IT | 27.12.2006 | ES | 07.04.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 27.12.2006 | |
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
FR | 17.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | GB | 27.12.2006 | |
IT | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0324439 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [DY]JPH03127424 ; | [A]JPH03179629 ; | [A]JPH05182573 ; | [A]JPH04282525 ; | [PX]EP0838829 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910826), vol. 015, no. 334, Database accession no. (E - 1104), & JP03127424 A 19910530 (FUJITSU LTD) [DY] 1,2,5,7,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911030), vol. 015, no. 428, Database accession no. (E - 1128), & JP03179629 A 19910805 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931028), vol. 017, no. 593, Database accession no. (E - 1454), & JP05182573 A 19930723 (ANRITSU CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930222), vol. 017, no. 089, Database accession no. (E - 1323), & JP04282525 A 19921007 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |