EP0959479 - A method for controlling velocity of an armature of an electromagnetic actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Danny O. P.O. Box 27 Cobb's Creek, VA 23035 / US | 02 /
Czimmek, Perry R. 117 Wind Forest Lane Yorktown, VA 23962 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99105732.4 | 22.03.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980083329P | 28.04.1998 Original published format: US 83329 P | US19980083351P | 28.04.1998 Original published format: US 83351 P | US19980122042 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: US 122042 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0959479 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0959479 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959479 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/18, F01L9/04 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
H01F7/1844 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F01L2201/00 (EP,US);
H01F7/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/19] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung der Geschwindigkeit eines Ankers in einem elektromagnetischem Aktuator | [1999/47] | English: | A method for controlling velocity of an armature of an electromagnetic actuator | [1999/47] | French: | Procédé de régulation pour la vitesse de l'armature d'un actionneur électromagnétique | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09320841 ; | [A]US4690371 (BOSLEY ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, lines 17-27 * * column 3, lines 65-67 * * column 5, lines 21-27 * * column 5, lines 56-62 * * column 6, lines 21-65 ** figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE4434684 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-27 * column 1, lines 3-7 * * column 3, lines 35-51 * * column 3, lines 59-61 * * figure 1 * * figure 4 *; | [XA]DE19544207 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, line 66 - page 3, line 1 * * page 4, lines 37-41 * * page 4, line 68 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, lines 18-38 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-27; | [A]US5645019 (LIANG FENG [US], et al) [A] 1,7,11,16 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 5, lines 1-4 *; | [XA]US5708355 (SCHREY EKKEHARD [DE]) [X] 1,11,19 * column 1, lines 12-20 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 2 * [A] 2-10,12-18,20-27 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09320841 A 19971212 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * |