EP0949021 - Device for the forming of wire, with a wire braking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAFIOS Aktiengesellschaft Silberburgstrasse 5 72764 Reutlingen/Württ. / DE | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sautter, Dietmar Scheffelstrasse 38 72805 Lichtenstein / DE | 02 /
Schur, Andreas Fabrikstrasse 45 72581 Dettingen/Erms / DE | 03 /
Speck, Norbert Rheinstrasse 82 72768 Reutlingen-Altenburg / DE | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Michael Schafgärten 29 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Wolff, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. Kirchheimer Strasse 69 70619 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105833.0 | 23.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | DE1998116403 | 11.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816403 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949021 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949021 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949021 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/00 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B21F1/008 (EP,US);
B21F1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/40] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Formen von Draht, mit einer Drahtbremseinrichtung | [1999/41] | English: | Device for the forming of wire, with a wire braking device | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif pour le formage de fil ayant un dispositif de freinage de fil | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 10.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4229294 (WAFIOS MASCHINEN WAGNER [DE]) [AD] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE19736468 (ITAYA SEISAKU SHO K K [JP]) [AD] 1,6 * column 7, lines 5-19; figure 6 * |