EP0947387 - Burglary-proof convenience key-holding receptacle for motor-vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crescenzi, Renzo Via Romeo Turrin, 3 33084 Cordenons (PN) / IT | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Dalla Rosa, Adriano European Patent Attorney SEBRINT Via Vettorel 3 31015 Conegliano (TV) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Dalla Rosa, Adriano Via S. Vito 13/B 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 99105839.7 | 23.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | IT1998PN00021U | 30.03.1998 Original published format: IT PN980021 U | [1999/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947387 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/08 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
B60R7/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antidiebstahl, praktisches Gehaüse zur Schlüsselaufbewahrung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1999/40] | English: | Burglary-proof convenience key-holding receptacle for motor-vehicles | [1999/40] | French: | Logement porte-clefs antivol à convenance pour véhicules | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3092244 (MCWHIRTER WAYNE T) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,4; | [Y]US3867823 (WALTOWER NAPOLEON) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 32 *; | [A]DE3719647 (BUMAT MASCHINEN UND ANLAGEN TE [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure - * * claim - *; | [A]US2735597 (HOWARD E. TRELEVEN) [A] 1-4 * figure - * * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 27 *; | [A]EP0721859 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 12 * * column 7, line 23 - line 52 *; | [A]FR1325668 (R L H K AUTO SERVICE SA) [A] 1,4 * figure - * * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 2, column 1, line 2 *; | [A]FR2044109 (BORIS FRANCOIS) [A] 1 * figure - * |