EP0945278 - Head loading device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiida, Sakae 1349-12, Okanomiya Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Kamano, Tadao 525-1, Mifuku, Ohitocho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Akuzawa, Yoshihide 1304, Kashiwakubo, Shuzenjicho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Ushiogi, Hitoshi 2-13, Higashiitchoda Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/39] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106010.4 | 25.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980081226 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8122698 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945278 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945278 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945278 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/308 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
B41J25/308 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (KR);
B41J25/3082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/13] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopfbelastungsvorrichtung | [1999/39] | English: | Head loading device | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif de chargement de tête | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.09.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | FR | 11.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58145459 ; | [A]GB2050252 (CANON KK) [A] 1,2* page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 10; figures 56-61 *; | [A]EP0539838 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 42 - column 9, line 28; figures 1-4B *; | [YA]JPH07314850 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0059] * * abstract * [A] 3-5; | [YPA]EP0893263 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [YP] 1,2,6 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 37; figures 2,10A-10D * [AP] 3-5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831125), vol. 7, no. 265, Database accession no. (M - 258)<1410>, & JP58145459 A 19830830 (RICOH K.K.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |