EP0972528 - Radioimmunoconjugate for use in human therapy and its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benes, Ivan Friedrich Dr. med. Dr. rer. nat. PhD. Im Dornacher 7 8127 Forch / CH | For all designated states Bosslet, Klaus, Dr. Minheimer Strasse 6 13465 Berlin-Frohnau / DE | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/03] | Allgeier, Kurt Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 14 27 79604 Rheinfelden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106013.8 | 25.03.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | DE1998113687 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813687 | DE1999111329 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19911329 | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0972528 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0972528 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/10 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6898 (EP,US);
A61K51/1027 (EP,US);
A61K51/1045 (EP,US);
A61K51/1069 (EP,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,US);
A61K51/1096 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2003/27] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Humantherapeutisch anwendbares Radioimmunkonjugat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2000/03] | English: | Radioimmunoconjugate for use in human therapy and its preparation | [2000/03] | French: | Radioimmunoconjugué pour application en thérapie humaine et son mode de préparation | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19813687 (BENES IVAN FRIEDRICH [CH], et al) [E] 1-36 * abstract *; | [X] - BECKER W ET AL, "THE USE OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND ANTIBODY FRAGMENTS IN THE IMAGING OF INFECTIOUS LESIONS", SEMINARS IN NUCLEAR MEDICINE, GRUNE AND STRATTON,, ORLANDO, FL,, US, (199404), vol. 2, no. 24, ISSN 0001-2998, pages 142 - 153, XP008003670 [X] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * abstract * * page 151; table 6 * | [X] - BECKER W ET AL, "RAPID IMAGING OF INFECTIONS WITH A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENT (LEUKOSCAN)", CLINICAL ORTHOPAEDICS, LIPPINCOTT, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), no. 329, ISSN 0095-8654, pages 263 - 272, XP008003791 [X] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003086-199608000-00033 | [T] - KEITH SKUBITZ ET AL, "The guide on CD66a, CD66b, CD66c, CD66e", PROTEINS REVIEWS ON THE WEB, (19991014), Proteins reviews on the web, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/PROW/cgi/srch.cgi, (20020524), XP002209605 [T] 1-36 * the whole document * | [T] - SEITZ U ET AL, "PREPARATION AND EVALUATION OF THE RHENIUM-188-LABELLED ANTI-NCA ANTIGEN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY BW 250/183 FOR RADIOIMMUNOTHERAPY OF LEUKAEMIA", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, BERLIN, DE, (199910), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0340-6997, pages 1265 - 1273, XP000952569 [T] 1-3,6-9,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002590050582 | [XP] - GOVINDAN S V ET AL, "90YTTRIUM-LABELED COMPLEMENTARITY-DETERMINING-REGION-GRAFTED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES FOR RADIOIMMUNOTHERAPY: RADIOLABELING AND ANIMAL BIODISTRIBUTION STUDIES", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (199811), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 773 - 782, XP000982306 [XP] 1-3,6-9,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc980040g | [T] - WONG J Y C ET AL, "A PHASE I RADIOIMMUNOTHERAPY TRIAL EVALUATING 90YTTRIUM-LABELED ANTI-CARCINOEMBRYONIC ANTIGEN (CEA) CHIMERIC T84.66 IN PATIENTS WITH METASTATIC CEA-PRODUCING MALIGNANCIES", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (200010), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3855 - 3863, XP000982303 [T] 1-3,6-9,14-16,19-21,30,31,33,35 * abstract * |