EP0947544 - Processes for treating a surface of a thermoplastic resin film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states OJI-YUKA SYNTHETIC PAPER CO., LTD. 3, Kandasurugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Ayako Oji-Yuka Synthetic Paper Co.Ltd 23, Touwada, Kamisu-cho, Kashima-gun Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Shibuya, Nobuhiro Oji-Yuka Synthetic Paper Co.Ltd 23, Touwada, Kamisu-cho, Kashima-gun Ibaraki / JP | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106105.2 | 01.04.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | JP19980107178 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: JP 10717898 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947544 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947544 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947544 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/12, C08J7/04 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
B29C71/00 (KR);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/38] |
Former [2002/20] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung einer thermoplastischen Harzfolie | [1999/40] | English: | Processes for treating a surface of a thermoplastic resin film | [1999/40] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de la surface d'un film de résine thermoplastique | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L]JP2000001554 ; | [A]US5152879 (THURM SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 64-68; claim 1 * | [L] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000001554 A 20000107 (OJI YUKA SYNTHETIC PAPER CO LTD) [L] 1-13 * abstract * |