EP0948192 - Image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanibata, Toru Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106501.2 | 30.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | JP19980088497 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: JP 8849798 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0948192 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0948192 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948192 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/401, H04N1/40 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H04N1/4015 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/40] | H04N1/401 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/01] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsgerät | [2003/43] | English: | Image recording apparatus | [1999/40] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement d'image | [1999/40] |
Former [1999/40] | Bilderzeugungsgerät | Examination procedure | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.03.2006 | FR | 31.03.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/30] | GB | 30.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19643135 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0772341 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 1,5,6 * page 2, line 14 - line 17 * * page 7, line 34 - line 36 *; | [Y]US5258248 (TOKUHASHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0501334 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0447958 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920528), vol. 016, no. 232, Database accession no. (M - 1256), & JP04047958 A 19920218 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] * abstract * | Examination | US5018155 |