EP0947603 - Film depositing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu Takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | [2007/24] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu Takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikami, Takashi, c/o Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu, Takase-Cho, Ukyo-Ku Kyoto-Shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Hiroshi, c/o Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu, Takase-Cho, Ukyo-Ku Kyoto-Shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106694.5 | 01.04.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | JP19980090224 | 02.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9022498 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947603 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947603 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947603 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/22, H01J37/12, C23C16/48, C23C16/505, H01J37/317, H01J37/32 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
H01J37/32082 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
C23C16/486 (EP,US);
C23C16/505 (EP,US);
H01J37/3178 (EP,US);
H01J2237/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/40] | C23C14/22, H01J37/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/51] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Filmabscheidung | [1999/40] | English: | Film depositing method and apparatus | [1999/40] | French: | Méthode et appareillage pour déposer un film | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 08.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09245995 ; | [X]JPH08335447 ; | [Y]JPH09208389 ; | [Y]US4870284 (HASHIMOTO ISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 68 * * figures 1A,1B,2,5 *; | [A]US4987346 (KATZSCHNER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 3-6 * figures 2,5,7A,10A-10C * * column 6, lines 50-68 * * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 3 *; | [A]US5317161 (CHALUPKA ALFRED [AT], et al) [A] 1-6* column 6, lines 31-68; figure 3 *; | [A]US5495107 (HU KE [US], et al) [A] 3-6 * column 5, lines 43-67; figure 8 *; | [A]WO9730464 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 3-6 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 25; figures 3,3A * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09245995 A 19970919 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08335447 A 19961217 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09208389 A 19970812 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * |