EP0992443 - Method and apparatus for picking up papers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomiyama, Katsuya NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ikegami, Kenichi, c/o NEC Robotics Engineering Ltd 1-25, Shin-urashimacho, 1-chome, Kanawaga-ku Yokohama-shi, Karagawa / JP | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106705.9 | 01.04.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | JP19980282815 | 05.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28281598 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0992443 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0992443 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992443 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/12, B65H1/02, B65H3/48 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B65H3/124 (EP,US);
B65H2301/321 (EP,US);
B65H2402/31 (EP,US);
B65H2406/32231 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | B65H3/12, B65H1/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2001/38] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen von Dokumenten | [2000/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for picking up papers | [2000/15] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour prélever des documents | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08259016 ; | [A]DE1203801 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [A] 10,34 * column 1, line 13 - line 16 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2219665 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [Y] 10-12,15,17,18,34,47,48 * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 1, line 20 - line 25 * * page 3, line 12 - line 28 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB1506111 (NEDERLANDEN STAAT [NL]) [X] 1,7,19 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 75 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]EP0480810 (POSTE [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,19,32,33 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 45 - line 47 * * column 4, line 3 - line 11 * * column 5, line 9 - line 51 * * column 6, line 29 - line 39 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 56 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 10-12,15,17,18,34,47,48 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08259016 A 19961008 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DA] * abstract * |