EP0962748 - Method and circuit for monitoring the functioning of a sensor module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Micronas Intermetall GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blossfeld, Lothar Dipl.-Ing. Dorfstrasse 16 79874 Breitnau / DE | 02 /
Janke, Ralf Dipl.-Ing. Lindenstrasse 17 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Mozartstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/27] | Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät, Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher, Dipl.-Ing. RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106806.5 | 06.04.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | DE19981024362 | 30.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824362 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962748 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962748 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/08, G01R31/28, G01P21/02 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G01R31/2829 (EP,US);
G01D18/00 (KR);
G01D3/08 (EP,US);
G01P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Funktionsüberwachung eines Sensorbausteins | [1999/49] | English: | Method and circuit for monitoring the functioning of a sensor module | [1999/49] | French: | Procédé et circuit pour la surveillance du fonctionnement d'un module de détection | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5495112 (MALONEY PATRICK D [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 6, line 6 - line 62 *; | [A]DE19510416 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE3829875 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 66 *; | [A]JPH05292571 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940214), vol. 018, no. 088, Database accession no. (E - 1507), & JP05292571 A 19931105 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |