EP0948980 - Character image display control method and apparatus, and storage medium therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-0046 / JP | For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0046 / JP | ||
For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tateishi, Kazuhiro 502-8, Mabashi Matsudo-shi, Chiba 271-0051 / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106878.4 | 07.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980094933 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9493398 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0948980 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0948980 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/22 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/44 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/47 (US);
A63F13/533 (US);
A63F13/822 (US);
A63F2300/63 (EP,US);
A63F2300/638 (EP,US);
A63F2300/65 (EP,US);
A63F2300/807 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/39] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kontrollverfahren und Vorrichtung zur Darstellung eines Charakterbildes sowie entsprechendes Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1999/41] | English: | Character image display control method and apparatus, and storage medium therefor | [1999/41] | French: | Appareil et méthode de contrôle d'affichage de l'image d'un caractère et support d'enregistrement correspondant | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/43] | 12.05.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.05.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2002 | 30.04.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0768105 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,21* figure 10 *; | [YA]US5649862 (SAKAGUCHI HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 3,18,22 * column 5, line 52 - line 57 * * column 7, line 38 - line 62 * [A] 5,12; | [XY]DE29715105U (BANDAI CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,14,16,17,21,23-26 [Y] 3,18,22; | EP0871137 [ ] (BANDAI CO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 13, line 38 - line 51 * * column 14, line 40 - line 47 * * column 16, line 55 - column 17, line 22 * |