EP0949753 - Control system for an audio amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundig Multimedia B.V. De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Grundig Multimedia B.V. De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg 1083HJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Jörg, c/o Grundig AG Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Pröll, Jürgen, et al Rechtsanwalt Grundig Intermedia GmbH Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Pröll, Jürgen, et al Rechtsanwalt Grundig Intermedia GmbH Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Pröll, Jürgen GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft, R-L 1, Patentabteilung, Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106938.6 | 03.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | DE1998115923 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815923 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949753 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949753 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949753 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/52, H03G3/30 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H03F1/52 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | H03F1/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/23] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für einen Audioverstärker | [1999/41] | English: | Control system for an audio amplifier | [1999/41] | French: | Système de commande pour un amplificateur audio | [2006/22] |
Former [1999/41] | Sytème de commande pour un amplificateur audio | Examination procedure | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4380824 (INOUE TAKAO) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 23 *; | [XA]US4198603 (ALDRIDGE FREDERICK A ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 1, line 52 - line 61; figure 1 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 32 - column 5, line 36 * * column 2, line 56 * [A] 3; | [X]EP0537792 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 29; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0399276 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS) [X] 1-3,9,10 * column 3, line 32 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0292105 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP) [X] 1-3,9 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US4939786 (ARMS LELAND B ET AL) [A] 1-3,9,10 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 2; figure 2 * |