EP0950736 - Spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkmann GmbH & Co. Weeserweg 60 47804 Krefeld / DE | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kross, Stefan Erlenweg 22 41751 Viersen / DE | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Sroka, Peter-Christian Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Sroka, Peter-Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Peter-C. Sroka, Dr. H. Feder, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. W.-D. Feder, Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107135.8 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | DE19981017314 | 18.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817314 | DE19981017315 | 18.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817315 | [1999/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950736 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950736 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01H7/86 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
D01H7/88 (EP,US);
D01H1/105 (EP,US);
D01H7/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/40] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spindel | [1999/42] | English: | Spindle | [1999/42] | French: | Broche | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 06.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB767868 (SPINNEREI KARL MARX VEB) [A] 1 * page 1, line 59 - line 81; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2788632 (WILLIAM DEWHIRST) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 72; figure 2; claims 1,5 *; | [YA]DE2404934 (VNII ISKUSSTWENNOWO WOLOKNA MY [SU], et al) [Y] 1 * page 22, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 4 * * page 36, paragraph 3 - page 39, paragraph 2; figures 1,3,4,15,18; claims 1,3 * [A] 3,7,8,17; | [A]DE4010019 (PALITEX PROJECT CO GMBH [DE]) |