EP0950870 - Combination type warhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDW Gesellschaft für verteidigungstechnische Wirksysteme mbH 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states TDW Gesellschaft für verteidigungstechnische Wirksysteme mbH 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH 81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muthig, Helmut, Dr. Höhenstrasse 2 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | 02 /
Arnold, Werner, Dr. Johann-Haas-Strasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Hummel, Adam, et al Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Hummel, Adam, et al EADS Deutschland GmbH, LG-PM - Patente 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107139.0 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | DE1998117266 | 18.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817266 | [1999/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950870 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950870 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950870 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/10, F42C19/095 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
F42B12/16 (EP);
F42B12/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, SE [2001/32] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kombinationsgefechtskopf | [1999/42] | English: | Combination type warhead | [1999/42] | French: | Charge militaire à effet multiple | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.03.2004 | [2004/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2341124 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * page 2, lines 23-32; figures 1,2 * * page 3, lines 2-38 *; | [Y]DE2553315 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [Y] 2 * page 5, lines 5-13; figure . *; | [Y]FR2310547 (REALISA ET APPLIC TECH ET [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 3, lines 8-19; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US3855933 (MESSINEO J) [Y] 12 * column 1, lines 45-55; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2406798 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [Y] 13,14 * page 2, lines 8-24; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB191128030 (WESTF ANHALTISCHE SPRENGSTOFF [DE]) [Y] 10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4463678 (WEIMER RAYMOND J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 16; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3912123 (BONGERS DANIEL [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1074991 (SOC TECH DE RECH IND) [A] 10,11 * the whole document * |