EP0953422 - Process and apparatus for effecting injection-molded-in foil decoration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atake, Hiroyuki DAI NIPPON PRINTING Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107473.3 | 29.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980134278 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: JP 13427898 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953422 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953422 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953422 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
B29C45/14016 (EP,US);
B29C45/1418 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14286 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14877 (EP,US);
Y10S425/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/05] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen einer Dekorfolie durch Spritzgiessen | [1999/44] | English: | Process and apparatus for effecting injection-molded-in foil decoration | [1999/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour appliquer une feuille décorative par moulage par injection | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.04.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/06] | ES | 30.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4360329 (HATAKEYAMA YOSHIHARU) [X] 1-3,7-9 * column 1, line 40 - line 45 * * column 2, line 12 - line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5667747 (HARDING GLENN T [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9 * column 9, line 21 - line 24 * * column 10, line 35 - line 38 *; | [A]US4075266 (THEYSOHN FRIEDRICH) [A] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 30 - line 38 * |