EP0951193 - Method for identifying the user of a portable phone in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - classification | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | 02.04.2004 | Change - classification | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Jae-duk 94-1, Imsu-dong Kumi-shi, Kyongsangbuk-do / KR | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107670.4 | 16.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | KR19980013788 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: KR 9813788 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0951193 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0951193 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,KR);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L9/32 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | ||
Former IPC [1999/42] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/39] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifizierung dem Benutzer eines tragbaren Telefons in einem Mobilkommunikationssystem | [1999/42] | English: | Method for identifying the user of a portable phone in a mobile communication system | [1999/42] | French: | Procédé d'identification d'un utilisateur d'un téléphone portable dans un système de communication mobile | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9708907 (ROSA STEPHEN P [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 17 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]GB2305073 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]JPH08205237 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-10; | US5878340 [ ] (ASAOKA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [ ] * claim - * | [A] - AHIMOVIC S M ET AL, "SERVICES FOR TOMORROW'S PCS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, (19931012), vol. 1, page 222-227, XP000607270 [A] 1-10 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1993.528381 |