EP0952069 - Transport trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMBAUR GmbH Dieselstrasse 20 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [1999/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Humbaur, Anton Dieselstrasse 20 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/43] | Charrier, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Charrier Rapp & Liebau Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107702.5 | 17.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | DE1998207370U | 23.04.1998 Original published format: DE 29807370 U | [1999/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0952069 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0952069 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952069 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B62D21/20 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
B62D25/2054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, IT, NL [2000/48] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Transportanhänger | [1999/43] | English: | Transport trailer | [1999/43] | French: | Remorque de transport | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 23.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5631874 ; | [DA]US3612569 (MARINELLI JOSEPH A) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810530), vol. 005, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 071), & JP56031874 A 19810331 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3612569 |