EP0957281 - Electromagnetically actuated brake especially for an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GMBH & CO. Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 D-76646 Bruchsal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfann, Jochen Alte Steige 8 75447 Sternenfels / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Horst Häuserweg 9 76698 Ubstadt-Weiher / DE | 03 /
Becker, Günter Abergavennystrasse 30 76684 Östringen / DE | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108285.0 | 27.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE19981021729 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821729 | DE19981038658 | 25.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838658 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0957281 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0957281 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16D59/02, H02K7/102 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
F16D55/28 (EP,US);
F16D59/02 (EP,US);
F16D65/0006 (EP,US);
H02K7/1025 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0058 (EP,US);
F16D2121/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2002/12] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisch betätigbare Bremse, insbesondere für Elektromotor | [1999/46] | English: | Electromagnetically actuated brake especially for an electric motor | [1999/46] | French: | Frein à actionnement électromagnétique en particulier pour moteur électrique | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 28.12.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19737485 (STROMAG AG [DE]) [E] 1-3,6,7,10-13,15-17 * column 3, line 12 - line 23 * * column 5, line 39 - line 65 * * column 6, line 31 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE8913767U (SEW-EURODRIVE) [X] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph L; figure . * [A] 4,6,8,14-17; | [PXA]JPH10306834 ; | [A]DE7922264U (CHR.MAYR KG) [A] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 * | [PXA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10306834 A 19981117 (MIKI PUURII KK) [PX] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 6,7,9,16 |