EP0953849 - Spin tunnel magneto-resistance effect type magnetic sensor and production method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komuro, Matahiro 12-2, Osecho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Kawato, Yoshiaki 10-12, Suehirocho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/44] | Application number, filing date | 99108288.4 | 27.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980120504 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: JP 12050498 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953849 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953849 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09, G11B5/00, G11B5/39 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (KR);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/098 (EP,US);
G11B5/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
G11B5/3909 (EP,US);
G11B5/3967 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49044 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/47] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spintunnel Magnetowiderstandseffektfühler und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [1999/44] | English: | Spin tunnel magneto-resistance effect type magnetic sensor and production method thereof | [1999/44] | French: | Capteur magnétorésistif à effet tunnel de spin et procédé de fabrication | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 23.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5650958 (GALLAGHER WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 27 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 3 * [A] 2; | [A]US5729410 (FONTANA JR ROBERT EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 2,5 * abstract ** column 6, line 1 - line 29 * |