EP0963979 - Method of producing 1,2,4-triazole starting from ketazin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2006/52] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagata, Nobuhiro Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Cpy, Inc. Yokkaichi Factory, 4-16, Hinagahigashi 2-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Nishizawa, Chiharu Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Yokkaichi Factory, 4-16, Hinagahigashi 2-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 03 /
Kurai, Toshikiyo Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Cpy, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108294.2 | 28.04.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | JP19980128997 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12899798 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963979 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963979 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,2,4-Triazolen ausgehend von Ketazinen | [1999/50] | English: | Method of producing 1,2,4-triazole starting from ketazin | [1999/50] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1,2,4-triazoles a partir de cétazines | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4390704 (BEER HANS [AT]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0030209 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]US4267346 (KAISER REINHARD, et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [YD]JPS5695177 ; | [Y]US4725421 (SCHIRMANN JEAN P [FR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0758642 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * claim 8 *; | [Y]US4283545 (KNORR HARALD, et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]US4323705 (KNORR HARALD) [Y] 1-12 * column W * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811021), vol. 005, no. 164, Database accession no. (C - 076), & JP56095177 A 19810801 (KOEI CHEM CO LTD) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * |