EP0935957 - Improved hydromassage bath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEUCO GUZZINI S.p.A. Via A. Avogadro, 12, Zona Industriale E. Fermi 62010 Montelupone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states TEUCO GUZZINI S.p.A. Via A. Avogadro, 12, Zona Industriale E. Fermi 62010 Montelupone / IT | ||
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states TEUCO GUZZINI S.p.A. Via Passionisti, 40 62019 Recanati (MC) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guzzini, Virgilio Via Duomo 13d 62019 Recanati / IT | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99108340.3 | 28.10.1994 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI02341 | 04.11.1993 Original published format: IT MI932341 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935957 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0935957 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/02, A61H33/00 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A61H23/0245 (EP);
A61H33/6036 (EP);
A61H33/6063 (EP);
A61H2201/0176 (EP);
A61H2203/02 (EP);
A61H33/0091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/33] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Hydromassagewanne | [1999/33] | English: | Improved hydromassage bath | [1999/33] | French: | Baignoire d'hydromassage améliorée | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/04] | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94203142.8 / EP0651987 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3550586 (BALAMUTH LEWIS) [Y] 1 * column 14, line 18 - line 33; figure 7 *; | [Y]US3585991 (BALAMUTH LEWIS) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 48; figure 2 * * column 6, line 15 - line 22 *; | [A]DE4034912 (STEINDORF) [A] 1* column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,2 * |