EP0949823 - Synchronization arrangement for a compressed video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zdepski, Joel Walter Thomson Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo F-92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99108407.0 | 04.05.1994 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | US19930060924 | 13.05.1993 Original published format: US 60924 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949823 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949823 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/62, H04N7/56, H04N7/24 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/236 (KR);
H04N21/2389 (EP,US);
H04N21/43 (KR);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4385 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/41] | Title | German: | Synchronisierungseinrichtung für ein komprimiertes Videosignal | [2004/06] | English: | Synchronization arrangement for a compressed video signal | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif de synchronisation pour un signal vidéo comprimé | [1999/41] |
Former [1999/41] | Synchronisierungseinrichtung für komprimiertenVideosignale | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94106965.0 / EP0624983 | Divisional application(s) | EP01109625.2 / EP1137286 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8400268 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]GB2177877 (STC PLC, et al); | [A]US4726019 (ADELMANN HARRY W [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 14, line 39 - line 67; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0488225 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * column A; figures 2A,2B,5A,5B; claim - *; | [A]CA2064320 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [PA]GB2261799 (DOWTY COMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB]) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5274681 (YAMADA HIROKI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-7 * column W *; | [PA]EP0577329 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [PA] 1-7 * column W *; | [A] - MONTGOMERY, "Techniques for Packet Voice Synchronization", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (19831201), vol. sac-1, no. 6, pages 1022 - 1028, XP000563228 [A] 1-7 * page 1025, paragraph III.D - page 1027, paragraph IV.B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.1983.1146024 | [A] - LEDUC ET AL., "Universal VBR Videocodecs for ATM Networks in the Belgian Broadband Experiment", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, (19910601), vol. 3, no. 2/3, pages 157 - 165, XP000234961 [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0007]; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(91)90007-O | [A] - COCHENNEC ET AL., "Asynchronous Time-Division Networks: Terminal Synchronization for Video and Sound Signals", GLOBECOM '85, NEW ORLEANS, US, (19851202), vol. 2, pages 791 - 794, XP002050241 [A] 1-7 * page 793, paragraph 2 - page 794 * |