EP0953773 - A pump for liquids, in particular for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GATE S.r.l. Via Andrea Doria 15 10123 Torino / IT | [2004/27] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states GATE S.p.A. Via Andrea Doria 15 10123 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartolazzi, Andrea Via delle Carrozze 55 I-00187 Roma / IT | 02 /
Fassio, Fabrizio Frazione Revignano n. 33/A I-14100 Asti / IT | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99108411.2 | 29.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00371 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: IT TO980371 | [1999/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0953773 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953773 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F01P7/16 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
F01P7/161 (EP);
F04D15/0011 (EP);
F04D15/0016 (EP);
F01P2025/32 (EP);
F01P2070/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/28] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitspumpe insbesondere für den Kühlkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1999/44] | English: | A pump for liquids, in particular for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine | [1999/44] | French: | Pompe à liquides en particulier pour le circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 04.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.2004 | [2008/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS572417 ; | [A]JPH0255824 ; | [A]FR2455174 (SEV MARCHAL) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - line 24; figure . *; | [A]EP0265107 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820420), vol. 006, no. 061, Database accession no. (M - 123), & JP57002417 A 19820107 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900511), vol. 014, no. 224, Database accession no. (M - 0972), & JP02055824 A 19900226 (AISAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |