EP0954179 - Response capacity management in interactive broadcast systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wink Communications, Inc. 1001 Marina Village Parkway Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [1999/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Travaille, Timothy 5810 134th PL SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
Brubeck, David W. 1370 Third Street 311 Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108465.8 | 30.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | US19980070757 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: US 70757 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0954179 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0954179 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954179 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H04H20/38 (EP,US);
H04H60/41 (EP,US);
H04H60/64 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/38] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beantwortungskapazitätssteuerung für interaktive Rundfunksysteme | [1999/44] | English: | Response capacity management in interactive broadcast systems | [1999/44] | French: | Gestion de capacité de réponse dans un système de télédiffusion interactif | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4684980 (RAST ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,8 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6,7; | [YA]US5251324 (MCMULLAN JR JAY C [US]) [Y] 1,5,8 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 42 * [A] 2-4,6,7; | [A]EP0822718 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0776132 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5355480 (SMITH ELIZABETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |