EP0971188 - Cryogenic rectification system with modular cold boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Kenneth Kai, Engineer 60 Sundridge Amherst, New York 14228 / US | 02 /
Bonaquist, Dante Patrick, Engineer 1036 Ransom Road Grand Island, New York 14072 / US | 03 /
Billingham, John Frederic, Engineer 19 Daven Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | 04 /
Monteith, Michael Douglas 470 West Hazeltine Kenmore, New York 14217-1715 / US | 05 /
Prosser, Neil Mark, Engineer 6993 Iroquois Drive Lockport, New York 14094 / US | [2000/11] |
Former [2000/02] | 01 /
Wong, Kenneth Kai, Engineer 60 Sundridge Amherst, New York 14228 / US | ||
02 /
Bonaquist, Dante Patrick, Engineer 1036 Ransom Road Grand Island, New York 14072 / US | |||
03 /
Billingham, John Frederic, Engineer 19 Daven Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | |||
04 /
Monteith, Michael Douglas 75 Princeton Blvd Kenmore, New York 14217-1715 / US | |||
05 /
Prosser, Neil Mark, Engineer 6993 Iroquois Drive Lockport, New York 14094 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108467.4 | 30.04.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | US19980113174 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: US 113174 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971188 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/02 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
F25J3/04678 (EP,US);
F25J3/04 (KR);
F25J3/04303 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/0489 (EP,US);
F25J3/04945 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/38] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kryogenische Rektifikationsvorrichtung mit modularen Kühlboxen | [2000/02] | English: | Cryogenic rectification system with modular cold boxes | [2000/02] | French: | Système de rectification cryogénique avec des boîtes froides modulaires | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 02.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19725821 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US5349827 (BRACQUE GILLES [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US5412954 (GRENIER MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US3750413 (MILLIGAN J, et al) [A] 1-6 * column W * | [A] - "PROCESS AND FACILITY WITH PARTICULARLY HIGH AVAILABILITY", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19970501), no. 397, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 276 - 279, XP000726402 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |