EP0977389 - Configurable system for monitoring programme viewership and usage of interactive applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wink Communications, Inc. 1001 Marina Village Parkway Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Del Sesto, Eric E. 1082 Armitage Street Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 02 /
Travaille, Timothy V. 5810 134th Place SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 03 /
Michel, Christopher J. 3000 Adornos Way Burbank, CA 91504 / US | 04 /
Paquette, Jana J. RR4 Box 270 Oakland, ME 04963 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108472.4 | 30.04.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | US19980071003 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: US 71003 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977389 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977389 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977389 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04H9/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04H20/38 (EP,US);
H04H60/41 (EP,US);
H04H60/64 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/25883 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/16] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Konfigurierbares System für die Ermittlung der Zahl der Zuschauer und der Benutzung von interaktiven Applikationen | [2000/05] | English: | Configurable system for monitoring programme viewership and usage of interactive applications | [2000/05] | French: | Système configurable pour la mesure d'audience et de l'usage d'applications interactives | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.11.2006 | 31.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0822718 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11-17,19-24 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 25 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 44 * * page 11, line 2 - page 12, line 41 * * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 45 * * page 27, line 20 - page 27, line 43 * [Y] 10,18; | [DY]US5689799 (DOUGHERTY BRIAN P [US], et al) [DY] 10,18 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 46 *; | [A]US5374951 (WELSH RUSSELL J [CA]) [A] 1-24 * column 3, lines 5-39; figure 7 * * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 68 * * column 14, line 18 - column 15, line 35 * |