EP1050302 - Method for treating abnormal cell proliferation in the brain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissery, Marie-Christine 5 rue Henri Poincaré 94400 Vitry Sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Renard, Alain 2 rue Guynemer 75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
Besenval-Milleron, Michèle 6/8 rue Vulpian 75013 Paris / FR | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 99108516.8 | 03.05.1999 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050302 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2001/30] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von abnormaler Zellproliferation im Gehirn | [2000/45] | English: | Method for treating abnormal cell proliferation in the brain | [2000/45] | French: | Procédé de traitement de la prolifération anormale cellulaire dans le cerveau | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9413654 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * example - * * page 26, line 13 - page 29, line 18; claim - *; | [X]WO9632387 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * example - * * page 33, line 22 - page 37, line 9; claim - *; | [A]WO9631493 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * example - * * page 37, line 28 - page 41, line 18; claim - *; | [A] - SHU-HUI CHEN ET AL., "TAXOL STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS: SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF TAXOL ANALOGS MODIFIED AT C-7", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1994), vol. 4, no. 18, pages 2223 - 2228, XP000869521 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)80075-X | [A] - SHU-HUI CHEN ET AL., "SERENDIPITOUS SYNTHESIS OF A CYCLOPROPANE-CONTAINING TAXOL ANALOG VIA ANCHIMERIC PARTICIPATION OF AN UNACTIVATED ANGULAR METHYL GROUP", J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, no. 17, pages 4520 - 4521, XP000867047 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00069a005 |