EP0955125 - Cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Tatsuo, c/o Tsukaba Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1511, Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimomura, Hiroshi, c/o Tsukuba Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1511, Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108521.8 | 04.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | JP19980125031 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12503198 | JP19980168937 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16893798 | JP19980168938 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16893898 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955125 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955125 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/10, B23Q11/00, B23Q17/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US);
B23C7/00 (KR);
B23Q11/10 (EP,US);
B23Q11/1023 (EP);
B23Q2220/008 (EP,US);
Y10T408/44 (EP,US);
Y10T408/46 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303808 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304032 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304088 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | B23Q11/10, B23Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/08] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schneidwerkzeug | [1999/45] | English: | Cutting tool | [1999/45] | French: | Outil de coupe | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2001 | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [LPX]JPH10235534 ; | [A]JPH10113839 ; | [A]JPH0866816 ; | [A]SU807097 ; | [A]JPS56157834 ; | [A]FR667849 (FARRANT FREDERICK) [A] 4,11,13 * the whole document *; | [XA]US3062454 (COCKS ERIC H) [X] 1,4,11,13 * column 1, line 7 - line 58 * * column 2, line 12 - line 14 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 2 * * figure - * [A] 4; | [A]US4563115 (ABE HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 39 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0407836 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 39 - line 46 * * column 7, line 22 - line 55 * * column 31, line 26 - line 50 * * figures 1,35 *; | [A]US5072613 (BAER PATRICK H [US], et al) [A] 4,11,13 * column 3, line 15 - line 17 * * column 4, line 5 - line 29 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE4244026 (FARRAG EL TAHER [AT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5332341 (ARAI KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,6,8 * column 4, line 8 - line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO9517992 (HORKOS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,5; | [XY]US5451122 (NODA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 13 * * column 1, line 48 - line 51 * * column 3, line 16 - line 22 * * column 4, line 47 - line 57 * * figures 1,4-6 * [Y] 2,6,8; | [A]US5487629 (WATANABE FUMIO [JP]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, line 61 - line 62 * * figures 1,4,13 *; | US5791842 [ ] (SUGATA SHINSUKE [JP]) [ ] * column 2, line 44 - line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - line 23 * * column 5, line 53 - line 56 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 49 * * figures 2,3 *; | [LPX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10235534 A 19980908 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [LPX] 1,2,6,8 * figures 1,2,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10113839 A 19980506 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1,2,6,8 * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08066816 A 19960312 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP;TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 48, Database accession no. 1981-M3596D, XP002163488 & SU807097 A 19810223 (GORKI CONS TECH INS) [A] 9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820313), vol. 006, no. 041, Database accession no. (P - 106), & JP56157834 A 19811205 (SUNAMI RIKURO;OTHERS: 01) [A] 12 * abstract * |