EP0961235 - Tape storing and feeding mechanism for mailing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarter, One Elmcroft Road Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckley, Franklin J. 42 Putnam Park Road Bethel, CT 06807 / US | 02 /
Freeman, Gerald C. 185 West Norwalk Road Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108574.7 | 06.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | US19980073534 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: US 73534 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961235 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961235 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00, B41J15/04, B41J11/06 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B41J11/703 (EP,US);
B41J15/005 (EP,US);
B41J15/04 (EP,US);
G07B17/00193 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0025 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00532 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00556 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | G07B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bandpeicher- und Zuführmechanismus für Frankiermaschinen | [1999/48] | English: | Tape storing and feeding mechanism for mailing machines | [1999/48] | French: | Mécanisme pour le rangement de bande et pour l'alimentation des machines à affranchir | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH091883 ; | [A]JPH082754 ; | [A]US5467709 (SALOMON JAMES A [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPH07214835 ; | [A]EP0699537 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,12 * column 6, line 23 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US5175518 (SWANSON DANIEL G JR [US]) [A] 5,9 * column 3, line 6 - line 14; figure 11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09001883 A 19970107 (NEC ENG LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08002754 A 19960109 (MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUN SYST INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07214835 A 19950815 (NEW OJI PAPER CO LTD) [A] 15 * abstract * | by applicant | US19970951073 |