EP0958841 - Breathing mask [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAP Medizintechnik für Arzt und Patient GmbH & Co. KG Fraunhoferstrasse 16 82152 Martinsried / DE | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genger. Harald Wildmoostrasse 11 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | 02 /
Lang, Bernd C. Zugspitzstrasse 50 D-82131 Gauting / DE | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108650.5 | 14.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | DE1998122308 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19822308 | [1999/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0958841 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0958841 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/04, A61M25/02, A62B9/06, A62B18/02 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP);
A61M16/0633 (EP);
A61M2210/0618 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | A61M16/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/29] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beatmungsmaske | [1999/47] | English: | Breathing mask | [1999/47] | French: | Masque respiratoire | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5662101 (OGDEN DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 24 *; | [Y]DE1220738 (DRAEGERWERK AG) [Y] 1-6 * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2731624 (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 14 * * page 6, lines 15-27 * * page 15, lines 6-18 * * page 19, lines 21-26 *; | [A]GB1467828 (LAERDAL A) [A] 1-6 * page 1, lines 11-22 * * page 2, columns 19-29 * * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 15 * * figure 7 *; | [A]FR848126 (SPENGLER EMILE) [A] * figure 2 *; | [A]US5010884 (VAN DERDOES ARTHUR E [US], et al) [A] * abstract * |