EP0955098 - Device for disintegration of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stark, Franz 9213 Hauptwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Stark, Franz 9213 Hauptwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108870.9 | 05.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | DE1998119989 | 05.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19819989 | [1999/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955098 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/14 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
B02C18/145 (EP);
B02C2018/188 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zu Zerkleinern von Gegenständen | [1999/45] | English: | Device for disintegration of objects | [1999/45] | French: | Appareil de désintégration d'objets | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE29605276U (ZENO ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINENBA) [X] 1-4,12,15,20 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 4; figure 1 * [A] 5-11,13,14,16-19; | [XA]DE4400297 (ECO UMWELTTECHNIK VERTRIEBS GM) [X] 1-4,12,15,20 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 * [A] 5-11,13,14,16,17; | [XA]DE4444541 (CZERWINSKI ACHIM) [X] 1-4,12,15,20 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 * [A] 5-11,13,14,16,17 |