EP1052864 - Mobile terminal having a protection mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony International (Europe) GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2004/11] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Sony International (Europe) GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieschke, Arnd Steffen c/o Sony Int.(Europe) GmbH, Humboldt Strasse 8 85609 Aschheim / DE | 02 /
Winkler, Gregor c/o Sony Int.(Europe) GmbH, Humboldt Strasse 8 85609 Aschheim / DE | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99109449.1 | 11.05.1999 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052864 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/31] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät mit Schutzmodus | [2000/46] | English: | Mobile terminal having a protection mode | [2000/46] | French: | Terminal mobile avec un mode de protection | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19744263 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 2-5,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 1,6-9,14; | [A]EP0830046 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,2,4-6,9-14 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 55 * |