EP0962834 - Toner supply roll including cylindrical polyurethane sponge structure having helical protrusions on its outer surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keita, Shiraki, c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Akihiko, Kaji, c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99109848.4 | 19.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | JP19980157504 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15750498 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962834 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962834 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962834 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G03G15/0808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/14] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tonerzuführrolle mit einer zylindrischen Polyurethanschwammstruktur und schraubenförmigen Ausbuchtungen auf der äusseren Oberfläche | [1999/49] | English: | Toner supply roll including cylindrical polyurethane sponge structure having helical protrusions on its outer surface | [1999/49] | French: | Rouleau d'alimentation de toner avec une structure d'éponge cylindrique en polyuréthane poreuse et avec des protubérances hélicoidales sur sa surface extérieure | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 29.10.2004 | [2006/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0789285 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,8-12 * the whole document *; | [YA]JPH07315617 ; | [A]US4399933 (ANDERSON DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6382710 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07315617 A 19951205 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [Y] 1,8-12 * abstract * [A] 2-7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880819), vol. 012, no. 305, Database accession no. (M - 733), & JP63082710 A 19880413 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |