EP0960889 - Phosphate or phosphonate containing binder for anti corrosive paints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlarb, Bernhard Dr. Dhauner Strasse 15a 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Wiese, Harm Dr. Zähringerstrasse 50 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Wildburg, Gerald Dr. Gronauer Strasse 35 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Rau, Maria Gyopar Dr. Heinkelstrasse 14 67454 Hassloch / DE | [1999/48] | Application number, filing date | 99110034.8 | 21.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | DE1998124087 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824087 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960889 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960889 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/24, C09D157/00 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
C08F230/02 (EP,US);
C08F220/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Phosphat- oder Phosphonatgruppen enthaltende Bindemittel für den Korrosionsschutz | [1999/48] | English: | Phosphate or phosphonate containing binder for anti corrosive paints | [1999/48] | French: | Liant contenant des groupes phosphates ou phosphonates pour la protection contre la corrosion | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.07.2003 | GB | 23.07.2003 | IT | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | SE | 23.10.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 23.07.2003 | |
GB | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | GB | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | NL | 23.07.2003 | |
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 23.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0727441 (BASF AG [DE]); | [DA]EP0221498 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]); | [A]EP0469372 (DEGUSSA [DE]) |