EP0960999 - Tilting window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boog, Rudolf Neugasse 11 6300 Zug / CH | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99110042.1 | 21.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | CH19980001158 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: CH 115898 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960999 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/52, E05F1/10, E05C17/28 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
E05C17/28 (EP);
E05D15/5205 (EP);
E05F1/1008 (EP);
E05C17/16 (EP);
E05F1/1261 (EP);
E05Y2201/474 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2000/38] |
Former [2000/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kippfenster | [1999/48] | English: | Tilting window | [1999/48] | French: | Fenêtre basculante | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.07.2000 | 20.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.07.2000 | 20.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.07.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   24.07.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.2001 | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2548989 (HARTMANN & CO W) [X] 1,2,6 * page 15; figure - *; | [X]DE2451556 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG) [X] 8-10 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [X]DE2142782 (NOTTER KG MASCHBAU EUGEN) [X] 1,3 * page 5 * * page 7; figure - * | by applicant | CH627226 | EP0385414 | CH688723 |