EP0972690 - Parking brake for motor vehicles ,vehicle trailers or similar objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Compact Car smart GmbH Industriestrasse 8 71272 Renningen / DE | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gausrab, Klaus Uhlandstrasse 38/1 75365 Calw-Hirsau / DE | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Klaus, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management FTP - C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Weiss, Klaus, et al DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP - C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110074.4 | 22.05.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | DE1998128468 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19828468 | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0972690 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0972690 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/10, B60T11/04 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B60T11/046 (EP);
B60T11/06 (EP);
B60T7/102 (EP);
F16C1/106 (EP);
F16C2326/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/15] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Feststellbremse für Kraftfahrzeuge, Fahrzeuganhänger od. dgl. | [2000/03] | English: | Parking brake for motor vehicles ,vehicle trailers or similar objects | [2000/03] | French: | Frein de stationnement pour véhicules automobiles, remorques de véhicules ou similaires | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0599238 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,14-16 * column 2, line 14 - line 51 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2087491 (THORNBER JOHN TITUS) [X] 1,4,5,14,15 * figure 1; claims 4,7 *; | [XD]DE1555185 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [XD] 1,4-7,11,14,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1; figure -; claims 1,2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE501425 (RUDGE WHITWORTH COMPANY OF AME) [A] 1 * claim . *; | [A]US1400286 (HELLER SAMUEL D, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, column 30 - page 1, column 80; figure - *; | [A]US2105298 (PIERCE ROBERTS GLYN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06115424 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940726), vol. 018, no. 398, Database accession no. (M - 1645), & JP06115424 A 19940426 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9527642 | WO9726163 | DE1555185 |