EP0946060 - Menu-driven television program access system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, INC. 7700 Wisconsin Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814-3522 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendricks, John S. 8723 Persimmon Tree Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
Bonner, Alfred E. 8300 Bradley Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/39] | Application number, filing date | 99110233.6 | 02.12.1993 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | US19920991074 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: US 991074 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946060 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946060 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (KR);
H04H20/06 (EP,US);
H04H20/10 (EP,US);
H04H20/42 (EP,US);
H04H20/79 (EP,US);
H04H20/86 (EP,US);
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04H60/39 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N21/2181 (EP,US);
H04N21/21815 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (EP,US);
H04N21/2221 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,US);
H04N21/2389 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/26208 (EP,US);
H04N21/26283 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4184 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42206 (EP,US);
H04N21/42653 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4385 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/47211 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/64307 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/6547 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8146 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US);
H04N5/602 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/0887 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N7/102 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
H04N7/17354 (EP,US);
H04H20/02 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (EP,US);
H04H20/95 (EP,US);
H04H2201/70 (EP,US);
H04H60/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04H60/74 (EP,US);
H04H60/94 (EP,US);
H04H60/96 (EP,US);
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | Menugesteuertes Fernsehprogrammzugangssystem und Verfahren | [1999/39] | English: | Menu-driven television program access system and method | [1999/39] | French: | Système et méthode de contrôle d'access de programmes de télévision à l'aide d'un menu | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 20.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94903361.7 / EP0673580 | EP98103750.0 / EP0862328 | Divisional application(s) | EP04001389.8 / EP1432248 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2007 | BE | 17.01.2007 | CH | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | IT | 17.01.2007 | LI | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | ES | 28.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4381522 (LAMBERT TREVOR) [Y] 1,17,21,38,60,68,73,79 * the whole document * [A] 2-16,18-20,22-37,39-59,61-67,69-72,74-78,80,81; | [A]US4528589 (BLOCK ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-81* abstract *; | [A]US4829372 (MCCALLEY KARL W [US], et al) [A] 1-81 * abstract *; | [A]WO8912370 (MONSLOW H VINCENT [US]) [A] 1-81 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 32 *; | [YA]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,17,21,38,60,68,73,79 * the whole document * [A] 2-16,18-20,22-37,39-59,61-67,69-72,74-78,80,81; | [A]EP0513553 (COMMODORE ELECTRONICS LTD [BS]) [A] 1-81 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9204801 |